AR HB1086 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Notification that HB1086 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas State Board Of Chiropractic Examiners Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas State Board Of Chiropractic Examiners Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseNotification that HB1086 is now Act 278
2014-03-12HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2014-03-11HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2014-03-11HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2014-03-11SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2014-03-11SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-03-06SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2014-03-06HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-03-06HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-03-06HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2014-03-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2014-03-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2014-03-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2014-03-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2014-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2014-02-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback