AR HB1082 | 2020 | 92nd General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2020-04-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2020-04-16SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2020-04-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2020-04-15SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2020-04-15SenateReceived from the House.
2020-04-15HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2020-04-15HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2020-04-15HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2020-04-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2020-04-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2020-04-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2020-04-10HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2020-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2020-04-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback