AR HB1068 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-06 - Notification that HB1068 is now Act 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Notice Of Write-in Candidacy; And To Set A Date Prior To An Election For Notice Of Write-in Candidacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Notice Of Write-in Candidacy; And To Set A Date Prior To An Election For Notice Of Write-in Candidacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-06HouseNotification that HB1068 is now Act 26
2015-02-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-02-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-02-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-02-04SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-02-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-02-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2015-01-26SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2015-01-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback