AR HB1049 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - Notification that HB1049 is now Act 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Membership Of The State Parks, Recreation, And Travel Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Membership Of The State Parks, Recreation, And Travel Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-28HouseNotification that HB1049 is now Act 17
2015-01-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-01-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-01-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
2015-01-20SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2015-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback