AR HB1046 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Permit Paid Maternity Leave And Paid Adoptive And Foster Leave For State Employees.
Title
To Permit Paid Maternity Leave And Paid Adoptive And Foster Leave For State Employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2017-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2016-12-12 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1046 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1046.pdf |