AR HB1041 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Notification that HB1041 is now Act 145
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Notification that HB1041 is now Act 145
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Secretary Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Waive The Certificate Of Indebtedness Filing Fees In Certain Circumstances.
Title
To Authorize The Secretary Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Waive The Certificate Of Indebtedness Filing Fees In Certain Circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Logan Jett [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Notification that HB1041 is now Act 145 |
2021-02-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-02-10 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended #1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2020-12-17 | House | Filed |