AR HB1028 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
Pending: Senate Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law To Extend The Time Period Authorized For The Registration Of A Motor Vehicle; And To Amend The Law Concerning Temporary Preprinted Paper Buyer's Tags.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law To Extend The Time Period Authorized For The Registration Of A Motor Vehicle; And To Amend The Law Concerning Temporary Preprinted Paper Buyer's Tags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-01-21SenateReceived from the House.
2021-01-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-01-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2020-12-15HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback