AR HB1023 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make An Appropriation For State Turnback For Counties And Municipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2025; And For Other Purposes.
Title
An Act To Make An Appropriation For State Turnback For Counties And Municipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2025; And For Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2024-04-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2024-04-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2024-04-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2024-04-25 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2024-04-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-24 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-23 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2024-04-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-02 | House | Filed |