AR HB1022 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-01 - Notification that HB1022 is now Act 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-01 - Notification that HB1022 is now Act 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Include White County In The Designated Route Of Rock 'n' Roll Highway 67.
Title
To Include White County In The Designated Route Of Rock 'n' Roll Highway 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-01 | House | Notification that HB1022 is now Act 26 |
2013-01-29 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-01-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-01-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-01-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-01-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed |