AR HB1020 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-11 - Notification that HB1020 is now Act 84
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-11 - Notification that HB1020 is now Act 84
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Extend The Limitation Of Liability For Permitting The Recreational Use Of Land To A Landowner Who Permits The Free Use Of The Landowner’s Property For Flying And Landing Aircraft.
Title
To Extend The Limitation Of Liability For Permitting The Recreational Use Of Land To A Landowner Who Permits The Free Use Of The Landowner’s Property For Flying And Landing Aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | Notification that HB1020 is now Act 84 |
2013-02-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-01-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-08 | House | Filed |