AR HB1008 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Penalty For Taking Campaign Funds As Personal Income; And To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Title
To Increase The Penalty For Taking Campaign Funds As Personal Income; And To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] | Sen. Keith Ingram [D] | Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D] | Rep. David Whitaker [D] |
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Rep. Vivian Flowers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do not pass. |
2017-02-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2016-11-17 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1008 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1008.pdf |