AR HB1002 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1002 is now Act 210
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1002 is now Act 210
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Terminate Certain Parental Rights Of A Person Convicted Of Rape To A Child Conceived As A Result Of The Rape And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Terminate Certain Parental Rights Of A Person Convicted Of Rape To A Child Conceived As A Result Of The Rape And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Sen. David Sanders [R] | Rep. John Baine [D] | Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] |
Sen. Jane English [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1002 is now Act 210 |
2013-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2012-11-21 | House | Filed |