AL SJR78 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 4, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 4, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home generated medical sharps, educational program for safe disposal of, established
Title
Home generated medical sharps, educational program for safe disposal of, established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Assigned Act No. 2010-186. | |
2010-03-03 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-03 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-02 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-02 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-02-25 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-02-25 | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced |