AL SJR70 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jails, encouraging the reduction of the number of people with mental illness in jails
Title
Jails, encouraging the reduction of the number of people with mental illness in jails
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-155. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-19 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-13 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |