AL SJR67 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - McCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - McCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the rights of unborn children
Title
Recognizing the rights of unborn children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | McCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported from Rules and carried over |
2013-04-23 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |