AL SJR6 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-531.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Stabler, Ken, death mourned

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stabler, Ken, death mourned

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-531.
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-10SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-10HouseMcCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10HouseReported from Rules
2015-08-07HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2015-08-07SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-07SenateReported from Rules
2015-08-06SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback