AL SJR47 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:34 p.m. on March 15, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:34 p.m. on March 15, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Jabo Waggoner Freeway, portion of I-65, named
Title
Senator Jabo Waggoner Freeway, portion of I-65, named
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 2:34 p.m. on March 15, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-03-15 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-03-10 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-10 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2016-03-03 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |