AL SJR19 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
William Dudley Melton, death mourned
Title
William Dudley Melton, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported from RULES from House RULES |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-21 | House | Pending House RULES |
2024-02-21 | House | Received in the House and referred to the House committee on RULES |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt - Adopted Voice Vote |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Pending Senate RULES |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Senate committee on RULES |