AL SJR11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 3, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 3, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Education and Department of Health, encouraged to implement voluntary influenza vaccination program in schools
Title
Department of Education and Department of Health, encouraged to implement voluntary influenza vaccination program in schools
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 3, 2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-176. | |
2012-04-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-03 | Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 434 | |
2012-04-03 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-03-22 | Rules Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from Rules 1 amendment | |
2012-02-14 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2012-02-14 | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |