AL SB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Act No. 2020-37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Act No. 2020-37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elmore Co., motor vehicle licensing division, transferred from judge of probate to revenue commissioner, salary of judge of probate and revenue commissioner further provided for, Secs. 45-26-81.40 to 45-26-81.46, inclusive, 45-26-242.20 to 45-26-242.26, inclusive, am'd and renumbered
Title
Elmore Co., motor vehicle licensing division, transferred from judge of probate to revenue commissioner, salary of judge of probate and revenue commissioner further provided for, Secs. 45-26-81.40 to 45-26-81.46, inclusive, 45-26-242.20 to 45-26-242.26, inclusive, am'd and renumbered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-37. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-03-05 | House | Holmes intended to vote "Yea" |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 204 |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |