AL SB74 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Health Officer, qualifications and appointment of revised, authority during states of emergency revised.
Title
State Health Officer, qualifications and appointment of revised, authority during states of emergency revised.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |