AL SB7 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Assigned Act No. 2016-430.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, trafficking, cannabis, minimum amount to constitute trafficking raised, Sec. 13A-12-231 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, trafficking, cannabis, minimum amount to constitute trafficking raised, Sec. 13A-12-231 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-25 - House - Martin motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Repass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - House - Martin motion to Accede (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-26SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-430.
2016-08-26SenateConference Committee on SB7 2016FS first Substitute Offered
2016-08-26SenateDelivered to Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. on August 26, 2016
2016-08-26HouseSignature Requested
2016-08-26SenateEnrolled
2016-08-26SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2016-08-25HouseMartin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 96
2016-08-25HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2016-08-25SenateMarsh motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 68
2016-08-25SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 67
2016-08-25SenateConference Report
2016-08-25SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-08-24HouseMartin motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 54 House appoints Martin, England and Baker
2016-08-24HouseConference Committee Requested
2016-08-24SenateMarsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 57 P&PO appoints Ward, Waggoner and Ross
2016-08-24SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-08-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51
2016-08-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 50
2016-08-23HouseMartin Amendment Offered
2016-08-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 49
2016-08-23HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered
2016-08-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-08-19HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-08-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2016-08-18SenateEngrossed
2016-08-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 13
2016-08-17SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 12
2016-08-17SenateWard Amendment Offered
2016-08-17SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 11
2016-08-17SenateWard Amendment Offered
2016-08-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-08-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB7&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016FS/PrintFiles/SB7-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=554018&VOTE=11&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=554020&VOTE=12&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=554021&VOTE=13&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555159&VOTE=49&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555161&VOTE=50&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555166&VOTE=51&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555394&VOTE=57&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555504&VOTE=54&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555851&VOTE=67&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555856&VOTE=68&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=555936&VOTE=96&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1069&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback