AL SB65 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Department, insurance fraud, statute of limitations increased, investigators of Department of Insurance Fraud Unit, power of arrest to include other state laws
Title
Insurance Department, insurance fraud, statute of limitations increased, investigators of Department of Insurance Fraud Unit, power of arrest to include other state laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1168 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1168 |
2024-05-08 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Insurance |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 228 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance |