AL SB56 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-420.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Facial recognition technology, use of match as the sole basis of probable cause or arrest, prohibited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facial recognition technology, use of match as the sole basis of probable cause or arrest, prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-05 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 940 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 849 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 848 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 847 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 23 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 22 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 849 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 848 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 847 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2022-420.
2022-04-06HouseSignature Requested
2022-04-05HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2022-04-06SenateEnrolled
2022-04-05SenateReed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 940
2022-04-05SenateConcurrence Requested
2022-03-31HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 849
2022-03-31HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 848
2022-03-31HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2022-03-31HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2022-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2022-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 23
2022-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB197 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB56&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB56-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB56-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/217323-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43343.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43529.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43929.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44545.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=671059&VOTE=22&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB56&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=671061&VOTE=23&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=686902&VOTE=847&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB56&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=686904&VOTE=848&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=686905&VOTE=849&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=687825&VOTE=187&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB56&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=687829&VOTE=188&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=687830&VOTE=189&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=689274&VOTE=940&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback