AL HB197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Artificial intelligence, limit the use of facial recognition, to ensure artificial intelligence is not the only basis for arrest
Title
Artificial intelligence, limit the use of facial recognition, to ensure artificial intelligence is not the only basis for arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 846 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 845 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Scott motion to Adopt Roll Call 845 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-03-31 | House | Scott motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | House | Scott motion to SB56 Substitute FOR HB197 a Companion Bill adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 846 |
2022-03-31 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB56 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-420.