AL SB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-348.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-348.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste program of a county or municipality, fees or charges, use of proceeds, amounts in reserve account over $1 million dollars authorized to be spent by county or municipality for law purposes, Sec. 22-27-5 am'd.
Title
Solid waste program of a county or municipality, fees or charges, use of proceeds, amounts in reserve account over $1 million dollars authorized to be spent by county or municipality for law purposes, Sec. 22-27-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1033 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 1032 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 90 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 89 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 1032 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 90 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 89 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-348. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1033 |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |