AL SB553 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Perry Co., county commission, filling vacancies
Title
Perry Co., county commission, filling vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 688 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |