AL SB485 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geneva Co., fire districts, establishment authorized after referendum, maintenance, board members, fire protection fee, dissolution
Title
Geneva Co., fire districts, establishment authorized after referendum, maintenance, board members, fire protection fee, dissolution
Sponsors
Sen. Harri Smith [I] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Smith BIR (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Smith BIR (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-546. | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1044 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 814 | |
2010-04-06 | Smith No. 3 Amendment Offered. | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Open | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 659 | |
2010-04-06 | Smith No. 2 Amendment Offered. | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Smith motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 655 | |
2010-04-06 | Smith Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Smith BIR adopted Roll Call 654. | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-25 | Request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-03-25 | Carried over subject to the call of the Chair. | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |