AL SB463 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Assigned Act No. 2014-308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Assigned Act No. 2014-308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., relief for Willie Dean Mount, futher provided for, Act 84-540, 1984 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jackson Co., relief for Willie Dean Mount, futher provided for, Act 84-540, 1984 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-308. |
2014-04-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1057 |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |