AL SB463 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Tourism Attraction Incentive Act, established, tax incentive and capital credits authorized for certain tourism attractions, Secs. 40-9B-3, 40-18-190, 40-18-193 am'd
Title
Alabama Tourism Attraction Incentive Act, established, tax incentive and capital credits authorized for certain tourism attractions, Secs. 40-9B-3, 40-18-190, 40-18-193 am'd
Sponsors
Sen. Slade Blackwell [R] | Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Gerald Dial [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] |
Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] | Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means Education | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 884 | |
2012-05-01 | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 883 | |
2012-05-01 | Scofield Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 882 | |
2012-05-01 | Scofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-01 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |