AL SB452 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, entertainment district or brewpub, sale of alcoholic beverages, Sec. 28-3A-6.1added; Sec. 28-4A-3 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, entertainment district or brewpub, sale of alcoholic beverages, Sec. 28-3A-6.1added; Sec. 28-4A-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over Lost Roll Call 1146 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1145 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |