AL SB423 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:37 p.m. on April 21, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:37 p.m. on April 21, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blount Co., municipality not located entirely in Blount County prohibited from imposing municipal ordinance or regulation in its police jurisdiction located in Blount County, regulatory functions and police or fire protection services in its police jurisdiction prohibited, except public safety mutual aid, const. amend.
Title
Blount Co., municipality not located entirely in Blount County prohibited from imposing municipal ordinance or regulation in its police jurisdiction located in Blount County, regulatory functions and police or fire protection services in its police jurisdiction prohibited, except public safety mutual aid, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:37 p.m. on April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Assigned Act No. 2010-552. | |
2010-04-21 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1090 | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Thomas (J) motion to temporarily carried over adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 721 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |