AL SB420 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-321.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bibb Co., co. medical examiner, act establishing repealed, Act 99-366, 1999 Reg. Sess., repealed; Secs. 45-4-60 to 45-4-60.17, inclusive, repealed
Title
Bibb Co., co. medical examiner, act establishing repealed, Act 99-366, 1999 Reg. Sess., repealed; Secs. 45-4-60 to 45-4-60.17, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 66 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-321. |
2015-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1120 |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |