AL SB41 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Assigned Act No. 2015-525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Corrections Department, appropriation in 2014-2015 General Fund budget, earmarking for Wetumpka Women's Facility deleted, Act 2014-284, 2014 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections Department, appropriation in 2014-2015 General Fund budget, earmarking for Wetumpka Women's Facility deleted, Act 2014-284, 2014 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 59 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-525.
2015-08-10SenateDelivered to Governor at 2:09 p.m. on August 11, 2015
2015-08-10HousePERMISSION GRANTED
2015-08-11HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-11SenateEnrolled
2015-08-11SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53
2015-08-11HouseClouse motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseClouse notive in writing filed
2015-08-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 46
2015-08-10HouseLost in second house
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05SenateEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31
2015-08-05SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 30
2015-08-05SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback