AL SB405 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credits, exemptions, deductions, enacted in 2019 Reg. Sess., or thereafter, expiration within five years from effective date, const. amend.
Title
Tax credits, exemptions, deductions, enacted in 2019 Reg. Sess., or thereafter, expiration within five years from effective date, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Hightower motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |