AL SB401 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-337.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., sales and use tax, co. commission to levy, distrib. of proceeds to fund ambulance service for citizens, penalties
Title
Macon Co., sales and use tax, co. commission to levy, distrib. of proceeds to fund ambulance service for citizens, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-337. |
2019-05-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-22 | House | Warren intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863 |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 845 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |