AL SB388 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-447.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-447.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, income tax refund check-off for contributions to Children's First Trust Fund, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.
Title
Taxation, income tax refund check-off for contributions to Children's First Trust Fund, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-447. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1289 |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1122 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |