AL SB383 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Assigned Act No. 2015-386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Assigned Act No. 2015-386.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Textbooks, purchasing of by boards of education, use of qualified depository for textbooks established, Secs. 16-36-60.1, 16-36-71 added; Secs. 16-36-62, 16-36-64, 16-36-65 am'd.
Title
Textbooks, purchasing of by boards of education, use of qualified depository for textbooks established, Secs. 16-36-60.1, 16-36-71 added; Secs. 16-36-62, 16-36-64, 16-36-65 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-386. |
2015-06-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1287 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1162 |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1161 |
2015-05-28 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 701 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |