AL SB300 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on April 21, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance companies, domestic, home office kept outside this state, requirement for duplicate records and office managed by officer of company deleted, records available to commissioner on request, Sec. 27-27-29 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance companies, domestic, home office kept outside this state, requirement for duplicate records and office managed by officer of company deleted, records available to commissioner on request, Sec. 27-27-29 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on April 21, 2010
2010-04-21 Assigned Act No. 2010-685.
2010-04-21 Passed Second House
2010-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1110
2010-04-21 Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1109
2010-04-21 Signature Requested
2010-04-21 Mitchell Amendment Offered
2010-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-21 Enrolled
2010-04-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Banking and Insurance
2010-04-06 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 819
2010-04-06 Third Reading Adopted
2010-02-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-01-19 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback