AL SB29 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax transactions, possession or use of automated sales suppression devices or phantom-ware to delete sales from cash register records, prohibited, criminal penalties, Sec. 40-29-121added; Sec. 40-29-119 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax transactions, possession or use of automated sales suppression devices or phantom-ware to delete sales from cash register records, prohibited, criminal penalties, Sec. 40-29-121added; Sec. 40-29-119 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseFurther Consideration
2015-08-11HouseMcMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-10HouseMcMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05SenateEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
2015-08-05SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 26
2015-08-05SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback