AL SB282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-384.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-384.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trusts, Alabama Uniform Trust Code, reports of breaches of trust, further provided, procedure for release of trustee, provided, Sec. 19-3B-1306 added; Sec. 19-3B-1005 am'd.
Title
Trusts, Alabama Uniform Trust Code, reports of breaches of trust, further provided, procedure for release of trustee, provided, Sec. 19-3B-1306 added; Sec. 19-3B-1005 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1012 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Coleman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1011 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 520 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 519 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Coleman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1011 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 520 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 519 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-384. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | House | Wood (D) intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1012 |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 520 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB474 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 3B | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 3B | 1306 | New Code | See Bill Text |