AL SB28 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
Pending: House Commerce and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and motorcycle dealer, used vehicle license plates, combined total increased, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and motorcycle dealer, used vehicle license plates, combined total increased, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 934 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 933 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 933 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 934 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
HB96 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
HB96 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 17, 2021.