AL HB96 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and motorcycle dealer, used vehicle license plates, combined total increased, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and motorcycle dealer, used vehicle license plates, combined total increased, Sec. 40-12-264 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1466 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-490. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1466 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 681 |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
SB28 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
SB28 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business