AL SB258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children and incapacitated persons, day care providers, leaving child unattended in a motor vehicle prohibited, criminal penalties, Amiyah White Act
Title
Children and incapacitated persons, day care providers, leaving child unattended in a motor vehicle prohibited, criminal penalties, Amiyah White Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - England motion to Previous Question (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - England motion to Previous Question (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-287. |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1048 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1218 |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1217 |
2013-05-09 | House | England motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1216 |
2013-05-09 | House | Buskey Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |