AL SB256 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn Screening Panel, procedure for addition of conditions to panel, further provided for
Title
Newborn Screening Panel, procedure for addition of conditions to panel, further provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Carried Over |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Children and Youth Health |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Children and Youth Health |