AL SB252 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Assigned Act No. 2022-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bullock Co., sheriff, salary and expense allowance, provided for
Title
Bullock Co., sheriff, salary and expense allowance, provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 792 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Forte motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 618 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 617 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 792 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - HBIR: Forte motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Forte motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 618 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 617 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 792 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
1998-02-20 - House - HBIR: Forte motion to Adopt Roll Call 791 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-266. |
2022-03-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 792 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |