AL SB242 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., simplified sellers use tax, distribution of the proceeds for public schools and volunteer fire depts, retroactive application, const. amend.
Title
Morgan Co., simplified sellers use tax, distribution of the proceeds for public schools and volunteer fire depts, retroactive application, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Local Application Roll Call 457 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 456 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 455 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Orr motion to adopt Local Application Certification Roll Call 445 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 444 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 443 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 456 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 455 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Orr motion to adopt Local Application Certification Roll Call 445 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 444 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 443 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-78. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 457 |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 456 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Orr motion to adopt Local Application Certification adopted Roll Call 445 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 444 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |