AL SB229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum additional payment
Title
Employees' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump-sum additional payment
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |