AL SB227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy benefits managers, practices relating to patient steering, price discrimination, fiduciary duty to client, price disclosure, etc. regulated, Dept of Insurance, duties and authorities revised, Act 2019-457, 2019 Reg. Sess., sections amended and renumbered; Secs. 27-45A-8 to 27-45A-12, inclusive, added; Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23, 27-45A-3, 27-45A-4, 27-45A-5, 27-45A-6, 27-45A-7 am'd.
Title
Pharmacy benefits managers, practices relating to patient steering, price discrimination, fiduciary duty to client, price disclosure, etc. regulated, Dept of Insurance, duties and authorities revised, Act 2019-457, 2019 Reg. Sess., sections amended and renumbered; Secs. 27-45A-8 to 27-45A-12, inclusive, added; Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23, 27-45A-3, 27-45A-4, 27-45A-5, 27-45A-6, 27-45A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1214 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1055 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1054 (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 1053 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 867 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 866 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 865 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 864 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 863 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1055 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1054 (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 1053 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 867 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 866 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 865 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 864 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 863 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-341. |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1214 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1055 |
2021-04-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1054 |
2021-04-29 | House | Ledbetter Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 867 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 866 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Butler Amendment Offered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 865 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Butler Amendment Offered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 864 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Banking and Insurance first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB492 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 20 | 6.16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 21A | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 45A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |