AL SB198 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to sentencing; to amend Sections 12-25-34.2, 13A-4-1, 13A-4-2, 13A-4-3, 13A-5-6, 15-18-8, and 15-22-54, Code of Alabama 1975, to add additional offenses that would be subject to the presumptive sentencing guidelines; to modify the criminal penalties for criminal solicitation, attempt, and criminal conspiracy; to give a judge discretion when sentencing a person convicted of a Class C or Class D felony offense; to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to sentencing; to amend Sections 12-25-34.2, 13A-4-1, 13A-4-2, 13A-4-3, 13A-5-6, 15-18-8, and 15-22-54, Code of Alabama 1975, to add additional offenses that would be subject to the presumptive sentencing guidelines; to modify the criminal penalties for criminal solicitation, attempt, and criminal conspiracy; to give a judge discretion when sentencing a person convicted of a Class C or Class D felony offense; to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Adopt NFACTT-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Adopt NFACTT-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-31 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-31 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-31 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Adopt NFACTT-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary NFACTT-1 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |